Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/22/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/22/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/22/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/22/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/22/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/22/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/22/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/22/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/26/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/16/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/14/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/04/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/11/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/26/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 08/01/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/10/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/19/2012