Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/12/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/12/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/12/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/12/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/21/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/21/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/29/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/09/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/10/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/10/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/11/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/12/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/12/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/17/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/19/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/24/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/31/2012