Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 09/11/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/12/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/12/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/12/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/12/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 09/13/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/13/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/13/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/13/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/13/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 09/19/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 11/13/2012