There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for the reappointment of Robert P. Kogod as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
06/24/2011Became Public Law No: 112-20. (TXT | PDF)
06/24/2011Signed by President.
06/21/2011Presented to President.
06/16/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H4315)
06/16/2011Committee on House Administration discharged.
03/15/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S1707)
03/15/2011Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1707)
02/28/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
06/24/2011Became Public Law No: 112-20. (TXT | PDF)
06/24/2011Signed by President.
06/21/2011SenatePresented to President.
06/16/2011-2:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/16/2011-2:04pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4315)
06/16/2011-2:03pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4314-4315)
06/16/2011HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
06/16/2011-2:03pmHouseMr. Lungren, Daniel E. asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
03/16/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
03/16/2011-2:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/16/2011SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/15/2011SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1707)
03/15/2011SenateSenate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1707)
02/28/2011SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/28/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/28/2011

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration02/28/2011 Referred to
03/15/2011 Discharged from
House Administration03/16/2011 Referred to
06/16/2011 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.J.Res.9. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-20 (06/24/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Reappoints Robert P. Kogod as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.