There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution honoring the victims and heroes of the shooting on January 8, 2011 in Tucson, Arizona.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
01/26/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 0. Record Vote Number: 1.(text: CR S259-260)
01/25/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/26/2011Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 0. Record Vote Number: 1. (text: CR S259-260)
01/26/2011Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S255-260)
01/25/2011Submitted in the Senate and ordered held at desk. (text of measure as introduced: CR S241)

Cosponsors (99)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/25/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/25/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 01/25/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/25/2011

Committees (0)

As of 08/09/2020 text has not been received for S.Res.14 - A resolution honoring the victims and heroes of the shooting on January 8, 2011 in Tucson, Arizona.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.14. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (01/26/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Condemns in the strongest possible terms the horrific attack that occurred at the "Congress on your Corner" event hosted by Representative Gabrielle Giffords in Tucson, Arizona, on January 8, 2011.

Offers heartfelt condolences to the families, friends, and loved ones of those killed in that attack.

Expresses hope for the rapid and complete recovery of those wounded in the shooting.

Honors the memory of Christina-Taylor Green, Dorothy Morris, John Roll, Phyllis Schneck, Dorwan Stoddard, and Gabriel Matthew Zimmerman.

Applauds the bravery and quick thinking exhibited by those who prevented the gunman from taking more lives and helped to save those who had been wounded.

Recognizes the service of the first responders who raced to the scene and the health care professionals who tended to the victims once they reached the hospital and whose service and skill saved lives.

Reaffirms the bedrock principle of American democracy and representative government, memorialized in the First Amendment and which Representative Giffords herself read in the Hall of the House of Representatives on January 6, 2011, of "the right of the people peaceably to assemble, and to petition the Government for a redress of grievances."

Stands firm in the belief in a democracy in which all can participate and in which intimidation and threats of violence cannot silence the voices of any American.

Honors the service and leadership of Representative Giffords, a distinguished Member of the House of Representatives, as she courageously fights to recover.

States that when the Senate adjourns on this day, it does so out of respect to the victims of this attack.