Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/09/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/09/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/09/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 05/09/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/19/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/23/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/26/2011