Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/10/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/16/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/16/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/19/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/19/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/23/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/07/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/08/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/09/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/14/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/16/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/30/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/05/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/07/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/11/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/13/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/25/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/26/2011