Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/06/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/06/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/06/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/14/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/25/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/14/2011