Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 01/26/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/26/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/01/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 02/03/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 02/15/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 03/01/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/17/2011