Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/07/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/07/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/09/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/09/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/09/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/13/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/13/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/14/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/14/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/14/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/14/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/14/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/15/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/16/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/20/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/20/2011