There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution encouraging women's political participation in Saudi Arabia.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/29/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5049-5051; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5050-5051)
07/27/2011Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
06/23/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
07/29/2011Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5049-5051; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5050-5051)
07/27/2011Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 114.
07/27/2011Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
07/26/2011Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/23/2011Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4103-4104)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations06/23/2011 Referred to
07/26/2011 Markup by
07/27/2011 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.Res.216.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.216. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/29/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on July 27, 2011. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Urges the government of Saudi Arabia to allow women to fully participate, both as voters and candidates for elective office, in the September 2011 elections.

Supports the women of Saudi Arabia as they endeavor to exercise their human rights and participate equally in society.

Expresses the belief that it is in the interest of Saudi Arabia and all nations to permit women to run for office, receive civic education, and vote in all elections.