Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 06/23/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/14/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/14/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/19/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/20/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/26/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/26/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/26/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 07/28/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/28/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/28/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/29/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/29/2011