Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 07/13/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/18/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/18/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/18/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/18/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/18/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/18/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/18/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/18/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/18/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/18/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/18/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/18/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/18/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/18/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/18/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/18/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/18/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/18/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/18/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/18/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/18/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/18/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/18/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/18/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/18/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/18/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/18/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/18/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/18/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/19/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/19/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/19/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/19/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/19/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/19/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/19/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/19/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/19/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/19/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/19/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/19/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/19/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/19/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/19/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/19/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/19/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/19/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/19/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/19/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/19/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/19/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/19/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/19/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/19/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/19/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/19/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/19/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/20/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/20/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/20/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/20/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/20/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/20/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/20/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/20/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/20/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/21/2011