Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 07/13/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/18/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/19/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/15/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/22/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/23/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/03/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/11/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 01/23/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 02/07/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/19/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/19/2012