There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution expressing support for the designation of November 16, 2011, as National Information and Referral Services Day.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/15/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7584)
11/15/2011Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7583-7584)
07/27/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
11/15/2011Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7584)
11/15/2011Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7583-7584)
07/27/2011Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4962-4963)

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/27/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/23/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 11/08/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 11/09/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 11/10/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/27/2011 Referred to
11/15/2011 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.Res.241.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.241. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (11/15/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)


Supports designation of a National Information and Referral Services Day on November 16, 2011.