Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/27/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/23/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 11/08/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 11/09/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 11/10/2011