Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/06/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/08/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/23/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/04/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/31/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/10/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 11/15/2011