Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/06/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/06/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/08/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/12/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/23/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/12/2011