Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/03/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/28/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/29/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/30/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/06/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/07/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/12/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/12/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/15/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 12/16/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 01/23/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 01/23/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/30/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 02/07/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/07/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/09/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/13/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/15/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/28/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/29/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/08/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/12/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/12/2012