Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 01/30/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/30/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/30/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/30/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/30/2012
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 01/30/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 01/30/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 02/07/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/21/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/26/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/27/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/29/2012