There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution to express the sense of the Senate regarding the importance of preventing the Government of Iran from acquiring nuclear weapons capability.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/16/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/16/2012Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S858)

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/16/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/16/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/27/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/27/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/28/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/29/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/29/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/29/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 02/29/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 02/29/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/29/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/05/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 03/05/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/05/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/06/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/06/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/06/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/06/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/06/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/06/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 03/07/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/07/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/07/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/13/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/13/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/20/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/22/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/26/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/26/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/26/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/28/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/28/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/28/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/29/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/17/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/19/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 04/25/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/26/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/08/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/08/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/14/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/17/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/17/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 05/17/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations02/16/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.380. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/16/2012)

Affirms that it is a vital national interest of the United States to prevent the Islamic Republic of Iran from acquiring a nuclear weapons capability and warns that time is limited to prevent that from happening.

Urges increasing economic and diplomatic pressure on Iran to secure an agreement that includes: (1) suspension of all uranium enrichment-related and reprocessing activities, (2) complete cooperation with the International Atomic Energy Agency (IAEA) regarding Iran's nuclear activities, and (3) a permanent agreement that verifiably assures that Iran's nuclear program is entirely peaceful.

Supports: (1) the universal rights and democratic aspirations of the Iranian people, and (2) U.S. policy to prevent the Iranian government from acquiring nuclear weapons capability.

Rejects any U.S. policy that would rely on efforts to contain a nuclear weapons-capable Iran.

Urges the President to reaffirm the unacceptability of an Iran with nuclear-weapons capability and oppose any policy that would rely on containment as an option in response to the Iranian nuclear threat.