Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/16/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/16/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/27/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/27/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/28/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/29/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/29/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/29/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 02/29/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 02/29/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/29/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/05/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 03/05/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/05/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/06/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/06/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/06/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/06/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/06/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/06/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 03/07/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/07/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/07/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/13/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/13/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/20/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/22/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/26/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/26/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/26/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/28/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/28/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/28/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/29/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/17/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/19/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 04/25/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/26/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/08/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/08/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/14/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/17/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/17/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/17/2012