Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 03/19/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/19/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/19/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/19/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/19/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/19/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/19/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/19/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/20/2012
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/20/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/29/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/17/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/15/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/16/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/17/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/01/2012