Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/22/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/22/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/22/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/22/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/26/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/27/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/27/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 03/27/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/29/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/17/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/10/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/16/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/07/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/20/2012