Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 04/25/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/09/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/09/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/09/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/15/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/15/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/21/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/21/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/24/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/06/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/14/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew