Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/09/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/05/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/05/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/11/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/18/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/10/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/10/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/10/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/10/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/10/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/10/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/10/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/12/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/12/2012