There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution designating the week of September 16, 2012, as "Mitochondrial Disease Awareness Week", reaffirming the importance of an enhanced and coordinated research effort on mitochondrial diseases, and commending the National Institutes of Health for its efforts to improve the understanding of mitochondrial diseases.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/15/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6870-6871)
11/15/2012Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6870-6871)
06/12/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
11/15/2012Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6870-6871)
11/15/2012Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6870-6871)
06/12/2012Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3982-3983)

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/14/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/20/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/25/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/27/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/16/2012
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/18/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/31/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions06/12/2012 Referred to
11/15/2012 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.Res.490.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.490. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (11/15/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the week of September 16, 2012, as Mitochondrial Disease Awareness Week.

Reaffirms the importance of an enhanced and coordinated research effort aimed at improving the understanding of primary mitochondrial diseases and the development of treatments and cures.

Commends the National Institutes of Health (NIH) for its efforts to organize a symposium to improve the understanding of mitochondrial diseases and to enhance collaboration and chart a course for future mitochondrial disease research.

Encourages NIH to place a greater priority on research into primary mitochondrial diseases, to continue to explore the connections between mitochondrial dysfunction and other systemic diseases, to promote collaboration and coordination among the Institutes of NIH and with other organizations, and to consider the recommendations and address research directions identified in the white paper developed from the symposium.