Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/14/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/20/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/25/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/27/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/16/2012
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/18/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/31/2012