Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/14/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 06/14/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/14/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/14/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 06/14/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/14/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/18/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/20/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/20/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/21/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/21/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/25/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/19/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/23/2012