Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 12/13/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 12/13/2012
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 12/18/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 12/19/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 12/19/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 12/19/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/20/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/28/2012