There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original resolution authorizing expenditures by committees of the Senate for the periods March 1, 2011, through September 30, 2011, and October 1, 2011, through September 30, 2012, and October 1, 2012, through February 28, 2013.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
03/31/2011By Senator Schumer from Committee on Rules and Administration filed written report. Report No. 112-9.
03/02/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1078-1083; text as passed Senate: CR S1078-1083)
03/01/2011Committee on Rules and Administration. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Schumer. Without written report.
03/01/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/31/2011By Senator Schumer from Committee on Rules and Administration filed written report. Report No. 112-9.
03/02/2011Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1078-1083; text as passed Senate: CR S1078-1083)
03/01/2011Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 15. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1062-1068)
03/01/2011Committee on Rules and Administration. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Schumer. Without written report.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration03/01/2011 Reported original measure S. Rept. 112-9

No related bill information was received for S.Res.81.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.81. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (03/02/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes expenditures by the following Senate committees from March 1, 2011-September 30, 2011, October 1, 2011-September 30, 2012, and October 1, 2012-February 28, 2013: (1) Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry; (2) Armed Services; (3) Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs; (4) Budget; (5) Commerce, Science, and Transportation; (6) Energy and Natural Resources; (7) Environment and Public Works; (8) Finance; (9) Foreign Relations; (10) Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions; (11) Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs; (12) Judiciary; (13) Rules and Administration; (14) Small Business and Entrepreneurship; (15) Veterans' Affairs; (16) Special Committee on Aging; (17) Select Committee on Intelligence; and (18) Indian Affairs.

Authorizes establishment of a special reserve within funds in the account "Expenses of Inquiries and Investigations," appropriated by the legislative branch appropriations Acts for FY2011-FY2013, to be available to any committee to meet specified unpaid obligations or expenses.