Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/01/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/01/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/07/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/07/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/04/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/04/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/06/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 04/07/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 05/04/2011