Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/09/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/16/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/16/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/24/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/16/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/16/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/25/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/31/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/26/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/08/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 12/11/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/29/2014