Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/12/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/18/2013