Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/07/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/07/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/07/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/07/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/07/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/07/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/13/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/14/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/15/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/18/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/19/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/21/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/15/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/08/2013