Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/13/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/15/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/09/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/03/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/08/2014