Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/13/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/10/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/08/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/12/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/03/2014