Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/09/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/16/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/19/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/28/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/07/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/19/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/19/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/22/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/18/2014