Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 01/07/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 01/09/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 01/27/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/04/2014