Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 03/06/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/09/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 01/13/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 01/27/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 01/27/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 01/29/2014