Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/22/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/03/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/08/2014