Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/11/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/15/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/03/2014