Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/12/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/12/2014