Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/16/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/22/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/09/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/12/2014