Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/23/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/20/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/29/2014