Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/11/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/07/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/19/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/29/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/05/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/12/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/01/2014