Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/28/2014