Refine your search

Refined by:

Wisconsin Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/09/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/24/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/29/2014