Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/15/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/20/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/09/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/07/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/07/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/03/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/03/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/06/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/28/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/28/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/28/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/19/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/19/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/16/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/18/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/27/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/30/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/04/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/16/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/27/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/28/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/04/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/29/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/23/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/29/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/29/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/05/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/17/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/17/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/19/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/19/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/23/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/23/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/25/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/09/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/16/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/16/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/31/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/09/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 09/09/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/09/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/09/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/15/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/12/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/12/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/12/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/12/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/17/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/17/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/01/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/03/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/03/2014