Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/11/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/17/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/23/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/24/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/18/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/16/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/20/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/02/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/28/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/07/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/23/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/23/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/29/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/19/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/23/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/23/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/23/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 06/25/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/16/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/22/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/24/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/28/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/29/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/29/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/19/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/12/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/12/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/13/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/01/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/01/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/11/2014